Accounts and annual returns LEAVES OF HOPE FOR BELARUSIAN CHILDREN

Charity Number: 1077872
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 May 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 May 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 22 May 2021 13 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 22 May 2020 02 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 22 May 2019 28 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 May 2019 13 March 2020 On Time