Financial history LEAVES OF HOPE FOR BELARUSIAN CHILDREN

Charity Number: 1077872
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/05/2017 22/05/2018 22/05/2019 22/05/2020 22/05/2021
Total gross income £39.84k £38.08k £32.23k £16.90k £2.06k
Total expenditure £37.91k £39.60k £32.74k £11.82k £299
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A