Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE TIBSHELF TOWN END JUNIOR SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1076192

Charity reporting is overdue by 1400 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 670 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 670 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1035 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1035 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1400 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1400 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window