Accounts and annual returns RELATE MID WILTSHIRE

Charity number: 1080492
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 March 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required