Financial history RELATE MID WILTSHIRE

Charity number: 1080492
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £521.12k £570.33k £519.09k £0 £0
Total expenditure £487.99k £526.25k £526.06k £105.85k £0
Income from government contracts £17.00k £110.49k £35.78k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.00k £12.00k £32.15k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £487 £1.37k £31 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £1.39k £1.92k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £519.03k £566.85k £518.97k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £217 £196 £90 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £487.33k £525.65k £526.06k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £660 £605 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £11.95k £0 £13.36k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A