Financial history FRIENDS OF STOCKERS LAKE

Charity number: 1080501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £10.37k £9.24k £12.40k £10.56k £11.38k
Total expenditure £3.87k £10.43k £10.63k £9.68k £10.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A