Trustees FRIENDS OF STOCKERS LAKE
Charity number: 1080501

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Andrew Daley | Chair | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Hugh Gray | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ashok Kumar Pattni | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Lansdown | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Green | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nilesh Chhaganlal Dodhia | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giles Dennis Lury | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Victoria Pazdzierska | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Roger Westbrook | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JOYCE ASCROFT | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HENRY BEEDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.