Accounts and annual returns SEEDTOHARVEST

Charity number: 1097136
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 April 2009 29 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 15 April 2008 18 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 15 April 2007 16 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 15 April 2006 15 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 15 April 2005 31 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 April 2005 Not Required