Financial history SEEDTOHARVEST

Charity number: 1097136
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/04/2005 15/04/2006 15/04/2007 15/04/2008 15/04/2009
Total gross income £6.45k £3.01k £2.46k £2.15k £2.29k
Total expenditure £6.43k £3.00k £2.13k £2.25k £2.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A