Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF OWEN JONES (EXCLUSIVE OF THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)

Charity Number: 1077809
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 06 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 06 October 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 30 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 30 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 27 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 27 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 06 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 06 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 26 May 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 26 May 2006 On Time