Financial history CHARITY OF OWEN JONES (EXCLUSIVE OF THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION)

Charity Number: 1077809
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £88.77k £93.60k £90.27k £90.74k £72.59k
Total expenditure £88.77k £96.86k £93.50k £90.74k £72.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A