Accounts and annual returns THE AFRICAN CHILD (UK)
Charity number: 1079610
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 17 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 12 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 13 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 17 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 07 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 15 November 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 10 February 2007 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 21 February 2007 | 21 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 24 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 14 November 2005 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window