Accounts and annual returns PORTLAND COMMUNITY MINIBUS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1079250
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 30 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 05 November 2008 5 days late