Financial history BRIMPTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL (SCHOOL FUND)

Charity number: 1079092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.76k £3.08k £10.79k £14.85k £10.09k
Total expenditure £6.04k £3.09k £7.65k £15.26k £11.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A