Trustees BRIMPTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL (SCHOOL FUND)
Charity number: 1079092

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graeme Holt | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma McCrae | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Moore | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jones | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jane Elizabeth Manley | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Harding | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rhoda Nikolay | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ZOE JANE BAKER | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.