Financial history WOLVERHAMPTON FOSTER CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1083170
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £79.64k £82.51k £103.94k £90.50k £97.85k
Total expenditure £72.85k £94.07k £103.25k £93.71k £94.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A