Financial history THE MF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1079921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.78k £2.83k £3.28k £1.96k £3.16k
Total expenditure £13.71k £7.02k £5.09k £6.01k £4.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A