Accounts and annual returns RELATE CORNWALL

Charity Number: 1080655
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 January 2017 On Time