Financial history RELATE CORNWALL

Charity Number: 1080655
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £144.57k £113.28k £101.52k £93.29k £96.72k
Total expenditure £189.83k £140.60k £101.62k £94.81k £93.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0