Accounts and annual returns VEGA SCIENCE TRUST

Charity Number: 1082718
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 15 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 29 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 28 February 2013 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 04 March 2013 32 days late