Financial history PARK LODGE PROJECT

Charity number: 1086450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £844.03k £887.03k £1.07m £1.46m £1.84m
Total expenditure £824.42k £891.97k £1.03m £1.34m £1.74m
Income from government contracts N/A £791.10k £1.05m N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.58k £91.41k £701 £112.95k £21.49k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £834.00k £791.10k £1.05m £1.34m £1.82m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.46k £2 £1 £38 £18
Income - Other £0 £4.53k £19.11k £1.64k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £824.42k £891.97k £1.03m £1.34m £1.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.42k £0 £0 £33.17k £41.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0