Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE GENERAL ISRAEL ORPHANS HOME FOR GIRLS .JERUSALEM

Charity number: 1082320
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 May 2018 12 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2017 11 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2016 31 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2016 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2015 19 July 2016 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2015 Not Required