Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE GENERAL ISRAEL ORPHANS HOME FOR GIRLS .JERUSALEM

Charity number: 1082320
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2014 01/05/2015 01/05/2016 01/05/2017 22/05/2018
Total gross income £5.99k £5.38k £6.34k £5.80k £5.82k
Total expenditure £4.92k £6.13k £5.54k £6.14k £11.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A