Accounts and annual returns THE SAKYA THUBTEN LING TIBETAN BUDDHIST CENTRE (UK)

Charity number: 1080967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 19 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 13 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 10 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required