Financial history A.F.C. CORSHAM

Charity number: 1085733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £63.99k £45.63k £93.03k £95.51k £121.73k
Total expenditure £53.93k £33.43k £94.48k £92.49k £116.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 N/A N/A N/A N/A