Accounts and annual returns SHREENATHJI SANATAN TRUST - (S.S.T)

Charity Number: 1111809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 12 September 2024 220 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 21 April 2023 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 February 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required