Financial history SHREENATHJI SANATAN TRUST - (S.S.T)

Charity Number: 1111809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £736 £761 £264 £264 £264
Total expenditure £35 £656 £10 £35 £35
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A