Financial history HOLT MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity Number: 1081408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £17.13k £4.12k £8.46k £5.56k £11.01k
Total expenditure £9.82k £6.64k £15.08k £4.10k £10.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A