Trustees HOLT MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Charity Number: 1081408

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Bradshaw | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Isobel Williams | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Taylor | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Hill | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Bridgford | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Bridgford | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Eskdale | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR OLIVER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.