Financial history THE 1940 DUNKIRK VETERANS' MEMORIAL BENEVOLENT TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1081787
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009
Total gross income £7.65k £6.73k £8.19k £53.88k £1.82k
Total expenditure £7.06k £6.12k £6.93k £4.33k £3.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A