Accounts and annual returns THE YOUNG PERSON'S RESOURCE CENTRE - PORT TALBOT

Charity number: 1089061
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 11 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 27 May 2009 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 19 February 2009 19 days late