Accounts and annual returns WENTWORTH HOUSE USERS GROUP

Charity Number: 1095741
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2009 04 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2008 21 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2007 05 April 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2006 09 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2005 24 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 Not Required