Financial history WENTWORTH HOUSE USERS GROUP

Charity Number: 1095741
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2005 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009
Total gross income £0 £100 £0 £1.00k £268
Total expenditure £378 £450 £524 £2.53k £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A