Accounts and annual returns THE UNITED VILLAGES PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1090816
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 16 July 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 07 January 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 11 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 07 December 2011 On Time