Financial history THE UNITED VILLAGES PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1090816
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £287.33k £283.56k £262.14k £216.54k £252
Total expenditure £288.15k £274.92k £239.00k £253.34k £242
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A