Accounts and annual returns BUDE JUNIOR SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1082780
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 21 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 21 January 2018 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2015 01 February 2017 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not Required
Annual return 23 September 2014 24 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 September 2014 Not Required