Financial history BUDE JUNIOR SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1082780
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2013 23/09/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017
Total gross income £4.53k £4.51k £848 £0 £0
Total expenditure £2.74k £5.33k £2.75k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0