Accounts and annual returns PINNACLE EDUCATION SPORTS TRUST

Charity number: 1084761
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2011 04 April 2012 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2011 Not Required