Accounts and annual returns HYTHE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1083269
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2018 10 August 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 10 August 2019 11 days late
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 July 2018 1 days late
Annual return 30 September 2016 27 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 27 July 2017 On Time