Financial history HYTHE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1083269
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018
Total gross income £48.48k £55.24k £51.30k £46.78k £46.29k
Total expenditure £48.88k £48.43k £55.86k £49.77k £54.33k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A