Accounts and annual returns AXMINSTER MILLENNIUM TRUST

Charity number: 1090165
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 17 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 15 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 12 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 25 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required