Financial history MELTON AND DISTRICT FURNITURE PROJECT

Charity Number: 1086010
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £81.23k £99.99k £95.16k £113.10k £109.74k
Total expenditure £77.96k £80.89k £89.25k £112.23k £106.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.47k £16.96k £8.80k £11.80k £5.20k