Trustees MELTON AND DISTRICT FURNITURE PROJECT

Charity Number: 1086010
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IVOR RUDDLE Chair
None on record
Fran Hearn Trustee 25 January 2023
None on record
LEANDA SMALLEY Trustee 07 April 2022
None on record
GLORIA BLANEY Trustee 14 November 2021
None on record
MERELYN GREAVES Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Graham Greaves Trustee 11 July 2019
None on record