Accounts and annual returns THE NORTHWOOD HILLS 'A' TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity Number: 1084253
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2013 22 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2012 07 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2011 19 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2011 Not Required