Financial history THE NORTHWOOD HILLS 'A' TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity Number: 1084253
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2009 31/01/2010 31/01/2011 31/01/2012 31/01/2013
Total gross income £2.69k £1.97k £2.00k £2.00k £1.32k
Total expenditure £2.63k £1.87k £1.87k £1.87k £1.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A