Financial history AVON VALLEY RAILWAY HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1088545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £89.26k £80.19k £175.49k £42.00k £50.36k
Total expenditure £88.10k £92.22k £171.95k £69.20k £81.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.50k N/A £94.43k £4.20k £7.00k