Accounts and annual returns CHATTERBOX

Charity number: 1086174
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 18 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2015 23 September 2016 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2014 17 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2013 02 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not Required