Financial history CHATTERBOX

Charity number: 1086174
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2012 31/10/2013 31/10/2014 31/10/2015 31/10/2016
Total gross income £6.51k £3.90k £1.60k £0 £93
Total expenditure £8.93k £1.47k £3.18k £60 £1.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A