Accounts and annual returns BLACKHEATH CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity Number: 1087003
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2021 20 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required