Accounts and annual returns CORN EXCHANGE THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 1092736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 10 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 05 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 05 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 05 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 05 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 04 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 04 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 28 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 28 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window